Financial history PENNINE SAILING CLUB

Charity Number: 1129754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £30.71k £47.30k £31.43k £33.35k £40.87k
Total expenditure £26.12k £27.50k £41.42k £34.47k £57.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.43k £2.67k N/A N/A