PENNINE SAILING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the sport of sailing in the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
Governance
- 20 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Barnes | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hallitt | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Walker | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROGER HOLLIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ED CORTEEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.71k | £47.30k | £31.43k | £33.35k | £40.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.12k | £27.50k | £41.42k | £34.47k | £57.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 27 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 9 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR DINGHY SAILING AND WINDSURFING BY MEANS OF; A. PROVIDING TRAINING TO BOTH NEW COMERS TO THE SPORT AND EXPERIENCED SAILORS B. ENCOURAGING YOUTH SAILING BY PROVIDING BOTH A SAFE ENVIRONMENT AND EQUIPMENT FOR CHILDREN TO LEARN AND PARTICIPATE IN SAILING ACTIVITIES. C. PROVIDING THE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR GENERAL SAILING D. PROVIDING THE ORGANISATION FOR REGULAR RACING E. ENCOURAGE OTHER GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS TO MAKE USE OF THE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashmede
Edale Road
Hope
Hope Valley
S33 6ZF
- Phone:
- 01433621329
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window