GRESFORD UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 500111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to individuals or organisations for the relief of persons in need or distress within the old parish of Gresford (including the communities of Gresford, Rossett, Gwersyllt and Llay)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £3,056
Total expenditure: £3,103

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Roberts Trustee 07 January 2025
None on record
Rev Victoria Burrows Trustee 27 November 2024
STRODE AND JEFFREYS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jeremy Kent Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Michael Wilde Trustee 23 April 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dennis Wynne Trustee 23 April 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Catherine Lucas Trustee 23 April 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Bryan Apsley Trustee 23 April 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael Edwards Trustee 13 April 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STRODE AND JEFFREYS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Peter Higgs Trustee 20 March 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BERYL BLACKMORE Trustee 13 March 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TEMPS
Received: On time
ROBERT HAROLD WILLIS Trustee 17 February 2014
GRESFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JENNIFER DORIS DUTTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.87k £7.95k £100 £3.01k £3.06k
Total expenditure £3.49k £1.51k £0 £2.18k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Stancliffe Avenue
Marford
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL12 8LP
Phone:
07969653754
Website:

No information available