THE METHODIST CHURCH - BARNSLEY CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

continues to provide support and resources for the Methodist Churches of the Barnsley Circuit, ensuring the provisions of worship and facilities / buildings available to the church and the wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

33 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Findlow Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Nigel Kenneth Bonson Trustee 01 September 2024
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Janice Dorothy Parkin Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Gwenyth Harrison Trustee 01 March 2024
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Dianne Charlesworth Trustee 01 March 2024
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
Rev Lyn Patricia Gregg Trustee 01 September 2023
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Wan Foong Loh Trustee 13 July 2023
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Joan Haywood Trustee 13 July 2023
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
John Pearson Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Jennifer Pearson Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Carol Jewkes Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Alison Padgett Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Christine Margaret Harrington Trustee 01 June 2022
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
DAPHNE IRWIN Trustee 01 March 2022
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
Anne Elizabeth Hamby Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Deborah Ann Evans Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Linda Joyce Stammers Trustee 01 September 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
DAWN WEBSTER Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
CLAIRE RAWLINSON Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
MRS Eliazbeth Ann Hambleton Trustee 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
Eileen Margaret Ann McHale Trustee 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
ELIZABETH ANN HAIGH Trustee 01 September 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
CATHERINE ANN MOSLEY Trustee 26 February 2014
None on record
Rev EILEEN SANDERSON Trustee 10 January 2013
None on record
REV LOUISE DAWSON Trustee 10 January 2013
None on record
LESLIE HOWARTH Trustee 10 January 2013
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
REV MICK NEAL Trustee 21 September 2011
BARNSLEY FOOD BANK PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
BARBARA TEWSON Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
MRS ELLIE PEET Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
HEATHER SHEILA HAGUE BSC HONS Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
MARY REASON BA HONS Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL WILLIAM SANDERSON Trustee
None on record
Rev ALAN SAXBY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £385.61k £321.67k £921.89k £1.72m £577.54k
Total expenditure £406.94k £551.66k £589.01k £640.91k £613.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.01k £37.13k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £7.47k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £271.61k £321.61k £340.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £3.45k £4.49k £28.13k
Income - Other N/A N/A £646.82k £1.38m £208.89k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £3.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £419.29k £433.55k £493.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £11.17k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.55k £9.43k £7.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £43.60k £8.00k £7.72k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £11.17k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £169.73k £207.36k £108.86k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A £1.16m £2.03m £1.57m
Long-term investments N/A N/A £601.04k £402.69k £1.04m
Other assets N/A N/A £718.21k £1.23m £936.42k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £950 £115.36k £34.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Emmanuel Methodist Church
72 Huddersfield Road
Barnsley
S75 1DT
Phone:
01226321522