KIRBY MUXLOE FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- KMFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Sanders | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA KINSEY | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
robert knight | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR PAUL WISDISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.62k | £93.51k | £89.90k | £97.98k | £80.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.55k | £103.94k | £99.19k | £93.05k | £85.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kirby Muxloe Free Church
Main Street
Kirby Muxloe
LEICESTER
LE9 2AN
- Phone:
- 01162871630
- Email:
- admin@kirbyfree.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window