THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH WEALD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved; taking of religious assemblies in schools; promoting Christianity through the staging of events and meetings; promotoing the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents, toddlers and other special need groups; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 02 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S PCC, SOUTH WEALD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Dora Bennett | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Conlon | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Denis George Clark | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Donna Falzon | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gelderbloem | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Reuben John Latchu BscMedElec | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jack Brisley | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Sarah Taylor-Staley | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celia Burrell FRCOG.LLM | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Alistair Hornsby BA | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Ruth Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bowyer | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Joseph Russell | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hill | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Mary Tyler | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER COLIN LUCK BA, LLB | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Jane Bradbury | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Philip Tyler | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
KERRY LOUISA OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MICHAEL ROGER BITSCHIN+ë | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILLIAN VERA JAYNE BITSCHIN+ë | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.21k | £166.49k | £167.30k | £167.90k | £173.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.23k | £152.62k | £130.45k | £165.42k | £141.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICARAGE
WIGLEY BUSH LANE
SOUTH WEALD
BRENTWOOD
CM14 5QP
- Phone:
- 01277212054
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window