VERMONT PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help young people with social or learning difficulties, emotional or behavioural problems. Providing support, teaching activities to develop skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society Provision of recreational and leisure time activities. Sponsor or promote research into best practise. Relieve need and to promote and protect physical and mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 06 August 2009: Standard registration
- 10 July 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £695 | £4 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £667 | £90 | £74 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 07 March 2014 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY THOSE WITH SOCIAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, EMOTIONAL OR BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS AND THOSE AT RISK OF FALLING OUT OF MAINSTREAM EDUCATION, BY A) PROVIDING SUPPORT, TEACHING ACTIVITIES WHICH HELP DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2. TO SPONSOR OR PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO BEST PRACTISE IN CARING AND SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 3. TO RELIEVE NEED AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARENTS AND FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS, GUIDANCE AND ADVICE INCLUDING IN MATTERS RELATING TO PARENTING AND LIFE MANAGEMENT ISSUES 4. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE VOLUNTEERING FOR THE ORGANISATION OR UNDERTAKING WORK IN SIMILAR AREAS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window