ORPINGTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritual and the furtherance of God's Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
Governance
- 28 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Teresa Chown | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Deborah May Price | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Joanne Jones | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neville John Secular | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Maddy | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Franklyn Brew | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon David Laurence Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dorrance Palmer | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Victor Stewart | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Charles Licence | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Barnes | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH HICKEY | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Price | Trustee |
|
||||||
IRENE FRANCES COTTERELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA CAROL EILEEN WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN ANNE LICENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET HALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE BARBARA BOSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH DOBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH IRENE WELLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.17k | £273.98k | £78.08k | £135.70k | £186.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.60k | £112.67k | £191.46k | £180.23k | £202.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orpington Methodist Church
Sevenoaks Road
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR6 9JH
- Phone:
- 01689 828391
- Email:
- office@om.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window