Trustees ORPINGTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1129331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Duncan John MacBean Chair 01 January 2025
CHISLEHURST METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WIDMORE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE MABOMBOH EDUCATION PROJECT
Received: On time
LOIS CLAIRE EAST Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Susan Teresa Chown Trustee 14 November 2024
WIDMORE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Deborah May Price Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Heidi Joanne Jones Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Neville John Secular Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Dr Emma Maddy Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Franklyn Brew Trustee 21 May 2023
WIDMORE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Simon David Laurence Jones Trustee 24 November 2022
The Ramfield Trust
Received: On time
Dorrance Palmer Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Charles Victor Stewart Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record
Robin Charles Licence Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Anne Margaret Barnes Trustee 05 November 2015
None on record
DEBORAH HICKEY Trustee 25 November 2012
None on record
JANET HALEY Trustee
None on record
STEPHANIE BARBARA BOSWELL Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH DOBB Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH IRENE WELLER Trustee
None on record
IRENE FRANCES COTTERELL Trustee
None on record
Christopher John Price Trustee
CRAY VALLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
TRANSFORM SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
ANGELA CAROL EILEEN WILLIS Trustee
None on record
CAROLYN ANNE LICENCE Trustee
None on record