THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, WOODFORD

Charity number: 1127596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities, Services to the Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £182,372
Total expenditure: £228,177

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S CHURCH, WOODFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Dr Elizabeth Margaret Lowson Chair 04 February 2021
THE WOODFORD PARISH CHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Shirley Lai Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
JACQUELINE PEACOCK Trustee 23 April 2022
WOODFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Kathy Wiltshire Trustee 22 April 2022
None on record
Adela Kay Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
John Wiltshire Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Kate Adu-Baah Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
PHILIP PETCHEY Trustee 11 October 2020
THE ANGLICAN SOCIETY FOR THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS
Received: On time
ABBESS ADELICIA CHARITY
Received: 25 days late
THE ELGAR SOCIETY
Received: On time
Viveca Dutt Trustee 11 October 2020
THE WOODFORD PARISH CHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Jano Elizabeth Goodchild Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Linda Jean Wiskin Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Gemma Low Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Sarah Reynolds Trustee 19 April 2015
THE WOODFORD PARISH CHURCH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
ANNE JONES Trustee
None on record
VALERIE FONE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £204.32k £142.68k £133.17k £200.99k £182.37k
Total expenditure £157.06k £170.40k £156.30k £160.19k £228.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARYS CHURCH
HIGH ROAD
LONDON
E18 2PA
Phone:
020 8505 3000