Accounts and annual returns MUDUG RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1130393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 September 2024 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2023 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 June 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 June 2022 506 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required