Financial history EXCEL/AGAPE CENTRE (AGAPE CHURCH)

Charity number: 1127632
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £34.33k £450.66k £192.39k £57.94k £193.75k
Total expenditure £42.20k £420.51k £196.94k £60.26k £196.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0