THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, HAYDON WICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As an Anglican church we conduct services each Sunday at 9am and 11am. We promote the Christian faith within the the church, including adults and children, and encourage outreach in the community. We provide pastoral care to the bereaved, the sick and elderly. We promote educational and medical work in Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 30 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST JOHNS HAYDON WICK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Mary Gash | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hosea Githi NJorge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Morton-Holmes | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Southgate | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Maureen Judge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William John Hunt | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ross Robertson | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Wiltshire | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|||||
James Hywel Bennett | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom Vandamme | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
RODRICK EWAN MCKAY MORTIMER TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON MORTIMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.23k | £141.27k | £137.08k | £139.45k | £155.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.03k | £142.01k | £149.22k | £147.28k | £136.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John The Evangelist Church
Thames Avenue
SWINDON
SN25 1QQ
- Phone:
- 01793726000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window