LINDLEY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship and prayer, learning about the Gospel and developing their knowledge and faith in Jesus Provision of pastoral care for people living in our community Wide range of regular Community activities, Scout,Guides,Lunch Groups, Playgroup,Out of School Clubs, Keep Fit, Ladies and Mens Choirs, Coffee mornings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 16 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Barbara Taylor | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Andrew Rudd | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Lee | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Vere | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Emery | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Fairbank | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Glenys Vere | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
David Schofield | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan O'Neill | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Blakeborough | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Froom | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Adam Bruce Swallow | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Vanessa Rudd | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hilary Fiona Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.74k | £115.69k | £144.68k | £152.22k | £156.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.51k | £125.56k | £125.63k | £150.26k | £149.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.25k | £700 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINDLEY METHODIST CHURCH
EAST STREET
HUDDERSFIELD
HD3 3ND
- Phone:
- 07775 237364
- Email:
- office@lindleymethodist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window