ROTARY CLUB OF GUILDFORD EYE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF AND CURE OF DEFECTS AND DISEASES AFFECTING THE EYES AND VISION OF PEOPLE WORLDWIDE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bangladesh
- India
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 January 2009: Standard registration
- GLOBAL SIGHT SOLUTIONS (Working name)
- GUILDFORD ROTARY EYE PROJECT (Working name)
- ROTARY'S GIFT OF SIGHT (Working name)
- CALCUTTA OPHTHALMIC CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- ROTARY CLUB OF GUILDFORD EYE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL JACKSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Fiona Pauline Miles | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Stuart Connell | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olayinka Oyetokunbo Osoba | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Ranger Miles | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.80k | £46.83k | £47.11k | £38.81k | £27.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.57k | £36.55k | £26.24k | £57.45k | £35.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/04/1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND CURE OF DEFECTS AND DISEASES AFFECTING THE EYES AND VISION OF PEOPLE WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Ashcroft
Shalford
Guildford
- Phone:
- 01483563242
- Email:
- andrewjnotary@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window