WILLESBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH, ASHFORD, KENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public services of Christian worship Children's programme Youth activities Pre-School Parent/Toddler Group Marriage Courses Alpha Courses Coffee mornings Lunches Art Group Walking Group Annual BBQ and Fun Day
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 15 January 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1173803 New Wells Church Family
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.10k | £149.90k | £138.14k | £148.53k | £141.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.93k | £164.24k | £143.57k | £154.34k | £117.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 07 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 07 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 November 2017 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
28 November 2017 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 December 2016 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 16 December 2016 | 46 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window