Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW WITH HOLY TRINTY HALSTEAD
Charity number: 1127357

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katherine Elizabeth De Bourcier | Chair | 10 November 2015 |
|
|||||
John Michael Gee | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Barry Everett | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Dodd | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Allen | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Willis | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Gay Kerrison | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Black | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELENA GEE | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ford | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SMITH | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Morris | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Tilsley | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PAISLEY | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Maree Robertson | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.