THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DENYS' NEW SLEAFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST DENYS' P C C (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Anthony Johnson | Chair | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA RANKIN | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA ROSALIND HITCHCOCK | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Snookes | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Stentiford | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR DOUGLAS FORSYTH AGNEW | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Minyon Ann Prescott | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD DOUGLAS JARVIS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ALICE JAKEWAY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH RAYMOND BAILEY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE EDWARD REGAN | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN STARKS | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN MARRIAGE | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|||||
DOUGLAS COLIN HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CLASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL RISDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.07k | £74.85k | £110.87k | £94.21k | £96.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.37k | £78.86k | £111.98k | £96.75k | £107.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sleaford Parish Church Office
St. Denys Church Room
Market Place
SLEAFORD
NG34 7SH
- Phone:
- 01529413607
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window