Financial history ENFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £269.55k £220.70k £235.01k £227.53k £362.17k
Total expenditure £353.36k £267.26k £340.09k £230.97k £279.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A