ENFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide a variety of activities for our own church family and for the wider community throughout the week. Our aim is to show the love of Jesus Christ in both word and deed and to bring people into a closer relationship with Him as living Lord. Central to our work and witness is our regular programme of Christian worship on Sundays. Anyone is warmly welcome to attend any of our services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £362,168
Total expenditure: £279,975

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elisabeth Kate Solomon Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
BEVERLEY CHUNG Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Lalnunthari Randall Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Barry Berndes Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
David Phillips Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Claire Yvonne Johnson Trustee 19 March 2023
None on record
Rev Andrew John Morgan Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Amen Tesfay Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Graeme Allen Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
LINDA CLARKE Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Dennis Muriu Trustee 21 March 2019
None on record
Frederica Hunter Trustee 21 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £269.55k £220.70k £235.01k £227.53k £362.17k
Total expenditure £353.36k £267.26k £340.09k £230.97k £279.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Enfield Baptist Church
Cecil Road
Enfield
EN2 6TG
Phone:
02083634263