Trustees ENFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127855

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Kate Solomon | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY CHUNG | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lalnunthari Randall | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Berndes | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Phillips | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Yvonne Johnson | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew John Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amen Tesfay | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Allen | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CLARKE | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Muriu | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederica Hunter | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.