THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WONERSH WITH BLACKHEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WONERSH WITH BLACKHEATH PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KEITH PETERS | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Charles Joseph Wakefield | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Jane Twist | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Louise Bounsall-Hughes | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CHARLES BAMBER | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Hepworth | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmina Ann Harlow | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Shepard | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Lister | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Talbot Gray | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Puttick | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Vinall | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Heine-Carmichael | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Keech | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Couzens | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Darren Alford | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Joan Vinall | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Allen | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.15k | £220.84k | £216.09k | £314.08k | £248.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.68k | £258.54k | £278.37k | £230.75k | £246.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
The Street
Wonersh
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU5 0PG
- Phone:
- 01483890453
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window