THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHOBHAM WITH VALLEY END

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, couses and small groups. Taking religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity through staging of events and meetings, and distribution of literature. Promoting the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Lomath-Carey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Reid | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Scawn | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Stratford | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elliot | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Stork Banks | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Coulthard | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Milton | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Baillie | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Coulthard | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Rose Stewart | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Rokeby Holland | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dan Stork Banks | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Lavinia Sealy | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Cook | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND CHRISTOPHER JOHN BEDFORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.13k | £123.40k | £137.99k | £149.85k | £157.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.99k | £150.57k | £149.27k | £179.50k | £196.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £700 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Lawrence Church
50 High Street
Chobham
WOKING
Surrey
- Phone:
- 07762022695
- Email:
- cchurch.treasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window