Accounts and annual returns DIVINE FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1127994
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 May 2024 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 January 2023 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 January 2021 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required