DIVINE FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian education, youth outreach ministry, counselling for the needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 11 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- (FEM) SALVASION CHURCH (Working name)
- FAITH EVANGELICAL MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YAW DANKWAH LLB, LLM, | Chair |
|
||||||
NORA BADU DIPHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE ODURO BSc HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIDA MFUM BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CONSTANCE BOATEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £6.00k | £10.00k | £25.00k | £16.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £5.00k | £1.20k | £24.50k | £15.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2024 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE HOLY BIBLE. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HYDE CLOSE
LEICESTER
LE3 9EW
- Phone:
- 01163196470
- Email:
- dpinash@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window