THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, RAINFORD

Charity number: 1127817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We promote Christianity through public worship, provision for personal prayer, pastoral work, Christian teaching, involvement with local schools, and Christian youth work. Our mission in the community is promoted through events, meetings, and activities for all age groups and in the support of missionary charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £203,484
Total expenditure: £272,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • St Helens

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS, RAINFORD, PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JANET ELIZABETH HEIGHTON Chair 19 January 2014
HENRY BISPHAM'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FRANK RICHARD PATRICK CHARITY
Received: On time
DANIEL ROSBOTHAM
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JAMES BASNETT
Received: On time
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Received: On time
OLD SCHOOL AND LYON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THOMAS LYON
Received: On time
THE BISPHAM CHARITIES
Received: On time
ORMSKIRK DEANERY MISSION GROUP
Received: On time
KENNETH HUGH WESLEY Trustee 26 May 2024
RAINFORD WELFARE AND OLD FOLK'S TREAT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
RAINFORD SILVER BAND
Received: On time
Winifred Helen Mackenzie Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Thomas David Roughley Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
MYRA HARTLEY Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Susan Duerden Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Keith Gratton Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Janet Margaret Foster Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Anne Pamela Morris Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Paul Michael Jones Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Rupert Henry Conquest Nichols Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Sarah Jane Wright Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Dorothy Lorraine Wynne Trustee 22 May 2022
ORMSKIRK MOORGATE DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Pamela Anne Davenport Trustee 31 October 2020
CRANK NURSERY LIMITED
Received: On time
June Philippa Wisedale Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Janet Nancy Davies Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
JUNE BURGESS Trustee
None on record
DAVID BURGESS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £213.77k £123.10k £165.67k £228.40k £203.48k
Total expenditure £227.71k £168.19k £186.35k £219.11k £272.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.64k £23.45k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 March 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 March 2024 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Church Road
Rainford
St Helens
WA11 8HE
Phone:
01744886448
Website:

rainfordparishchurch.org.uk