PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MARK'S HAYDOCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all..Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons,courses and small groups.Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for senior citizens,parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in he UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 16 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST.MARK.HAYDOCK PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sean Lally | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jessie PEARN | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard PEARN | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Dutton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Lister | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
LYNNE WILKINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN CARSON | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
LARISSA PEARN | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD HEYES | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
HANNAH DENNO | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT CARSON | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lauren Cockram | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DAN LEATHERS | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SUE ASHCROFT | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
BRENDEN GEORGE LISTER | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Denno | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
WENDY ANNE CONWAY | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ALISON JANE CARSON | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
IRENE MCGINN | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON PETER CONWAY | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BARBARA JEAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LES GREENALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
VERNA GLENIS JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.77k | £432.00k | £408.49k | £482.54k | £442.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.43k | £367.57k | £390.60k | £438.89k | £513.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.34k | £29.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARKS CHURCH
WEST END ROAD
HAYDOCK
ST. HELENS
WA11 0AX
- Phone:
- 01744732824
- Email:
- office@stmarkshaydock.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window