GUY'S GIFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT FOR BEREAVED CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,752 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 February 2009: Standard registration
- 04 February 2025: Funds received from 1014757 COVENTRY CHILDRENS CONTACT CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Main OBE | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Freeman | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jones | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE POTTER | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.83k | £77.06k | £529.90k | £104.66k | £92.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.65k | £90.65k | £102.89k | £180.23k | £204.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.43k | £8.05k | £6.38k | £15.86k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £3.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £69.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £460.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £98.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £3.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1 TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AFFECTED BY BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS, PARTICULARLY THROUGH GROUP WORK, SUPPORT, COUNSELLING AND EDUCATION, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION): 3.1.1 INCREASING A CHILD'S KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF DEATH; 3.1.2 INCREASING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE GRIEVING PROCESS; 3.1.3 PROMOTING OPEN COMMUNICATION WITHIN THE CHILD'S FAMILY; 3.1.4 RESPONDING TO THE INDIVIDUAL NEEDS OF EACH CHILD AND ITS FAMILY, ENABLING THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR LIVES IN A MEANINGFUL WAY; AND 3.1.5 ESTABLISHING ANY OTHER SERVICES AS MIGHT BE REQUIRED BY AN AGENCY DEALING WITH CHILD BEREAVEMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guy's Gift
Chandos Business Centre
87 Warwick Street
Leamington Spa
Warwickshire
CV32 4RJ
- Phone:
- 08454673035
- Email:
- info@guysgift.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window