SOUTH BRADFORD VOCATIONAL CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre offers vocational education, levels 1 and 2, in areas such as Business Administration, Catering, Child Care, Salon Services and Pre Uniformed Services to students aged 11-16 The provision of ÔÇÿGo LiveÔÇÖ courses to students aged 16-19 . Go-live is a programme of learning that allows students to study for a vocational qualification via out of school training and in centre education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 08 October 2009: Standard registration
- 03 May 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SBVC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £911.15k | £647.76k | £434.96k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £851.47k | £659.73k | £482.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £871.47k | £642.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £39.68k | £5.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £839.64k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.50k | £5.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £654.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £9.34k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 05 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 02 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE, PROVIDE AND/OR ARRANGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND LIFE SKILLS, FOR PERSONS BOTH BELOW AND ABOVE THE AGE OF 18 IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE BENEFIT AREA); (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR ENTERING EMPLOYMENT AND GAINING EMPLOYABILITY BY IMPROVING STANDARDS OF EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL PROVISION AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND BY PROMOTING THE ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BENEFIT AREA; (3) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING (AS THESE TERMS ARE DEFINED IN THE PREVIOUS OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY) BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION SERVICES AND FACILITIES ON TERMS CONSISTENT WITH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window