Trustees CARERS TOGETHER FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1128910

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Frances Masterman | Chair | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hide | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Renvoize | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Richard Parkin | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
William Gordon Mogg | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.