HARTLEBURY CASTLE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has been formed with the aim of acquiring Hartlebury Castle from its current owners, the Church Commissioners as the property is no longer required and they wish to dispose of it. We intend to acquire the property and grounds for the use and enjoyment of the community, and to allow the nationally important Hurd Library to remain intact and located within the Castle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
144 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Amphlett | Chair | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lois Maguire-Cox | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRUCE GRAHAM STICKLAND | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Harold Smith | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Kim Munday Mr | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Earl Mr | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul West | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Finch | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GREENWOOD | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.95k | £382.11k | £381.37k | £204.76k | £294.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.07k | £342.03k | £403.84k | £293.66k | £378.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £162.98k | £18.82k | £275.00k | £1.09k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2008, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PRESERVING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND OF THE NATION, HARTLEBURY CASTLE, ITS ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE, GARDENS, GROUNDS, PARKLAND AND HISTORIC CONTENTS, INCLUDING THE HURD LIBRARY; AND 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
HARTLEBURY CASTLE, WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hartlebury Castle
KIDDERMINSTER
DY11 7XZ
- Phone:
- 01299250797
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window