SALISBURY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities and the support of Local Community Groups and Uniformed Organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

28 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- SMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bradberry | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Cheetham | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Walker | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rutt | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Lake | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Liversidge | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Bishop | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Gilbert | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gilbert | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Tarlton | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kate Newton | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Turner | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
James Gillings | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Hilary Thorne | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Catherine O'Sullivan | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Dixon | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ROBBINS | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PALMER | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WEDDELL | Trustee | 03 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY IRENE PARKER | Trustee | 03 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EMERSON | Trustee | 14 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ELIZABETH GUNSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER JOHN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LEWIS BOOTH | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS LIZ CHICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLYN HEATHER CLARKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID MILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BATH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.36k | £182.67k | £168.29k | £185.04k | £178.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.70k | £125.00k | £141.03k | £224.22k | £152.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salisbury Methodist Church
26 St. Edmunds Church Street
SALISBURY
SP1 1EF
- Phone:
- 01722322755
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window