ST. PAUL'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH, HARROGATE

Charity Number: 1128076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing regular public worship for all. Promoting the Christian faith. Teaching the faith to all ages. Providing training, nurture and activities for children and young people. Serving the community. Giving pastoral care and support to members and others in need, particularly those in sickness, distress or poverty. Providing premises and resources for community groups and activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £88,116
Total expenditure: £81,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Fiona Turnbull Trustee 17 March 2024
MOWBRAY PARENT, CARERS AND TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days
Anne Jane Mitchell Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Gillian Hudson Trustee 16 February 2020
None on record
Philip Daggett Trustee 03 December 2017
None on record
Christopher Wright Harwood Trustee 03 December 2017
None on record
Julie Sanderson Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
MR MIKE WESTWATER Trustee
None on record
HELEN MORTON Trustee
None on record
ERICA ISABELLA MILLER Trustee
None on record
MARY ANN STEERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.70k £91.24k £80.79k £83.37k £88.12k
Total expenditure £127.00k £113.34k £81.10k £73.18k £81.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Strayside
Slingsby Walk
Harrogate
HG2 8LL
Phone:
07850325540
Email:
No information available