Trustees LONGMEAD COMMUNITY FARM LIMITED
Charity Number: 1130061

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan James Woodthorpe | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund MacRow-Wood | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richard Beech | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Frith | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sawdy | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Goodenough | Trustee | 29 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD CROWDER | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.