WARRANT OFFICERS AND SENIOR RATES MESS HMS SEAHAWK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of efficiency of the Armed Forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well being of Service Personnel. The trust fulfills these objective for personnel. Only eligible personnel may benefit and contain at least 51% within the meaning of the Charities Act.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2009: Standard registration
- WO&SR MESS HMS SEAHAWK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAPTAIN RN JAMES HALL | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.51k | £26.94k | £60.08k | £83.26k | £72.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.95k | £17.52k | £71.17k | £99.33k | £76.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 14 JAN 2009
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
R N A S Culdrose
Hms Seahawk
Helston
TR12 7RH
- Phone:
- 01326552529
- Email:
- jillian.tasker784@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window