NEATH PORT TALBOT METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Neath Port Talbot Methodist Circuit encourages, supports and enables the life of its nine constituent churches by providing ordained and lay ministry, and a structure of joint meetings, services of worship and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

39 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 23 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alfred Hugh Williams | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette John | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA TRAHAR | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Rachel Wheeler | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Vincent | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Frances Watts | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE PEARCE | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN HENRY SHERWOOD | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN SWINDALE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRACE CHRISTINE SOLLIS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVD GORDON WILLIAM SOLLIS | Trustee | 27 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Margaret Humphreys | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ruth Walters | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jan Davies | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOYCE SOUTHARD | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ROBERTS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CURTIS | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNNETTE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNWEN DAVIES | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
HILARY SUSAN SULLIVAN | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANICE GAYE GRIFFITHS BA, DIP ED | Trustee | 20 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN JOHN | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA THOMAS | Trustee | 16 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roger Swindale | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
CLEMENT BARRIE RAYMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DAVIES J.P. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE MARY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN CONSTANCE SHERWOOD ARAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE ANNE AMESBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATH WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM SOUTHARD BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET RAYMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYN JAMES AUBREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY HARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN HARDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR WILLIAM HARRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.72k | £106.00k | £92.00k | £98.00k | £119.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.73k | £104.00k | £81.00k | £100.00k | £89.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 LEWIS ROAD
NEATH
SA11 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01639644404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window