Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MILFORD ON SEA
Charity number: 1128038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Grace Richards | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Cecilia Richardson | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Whatmore | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MILLER | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pinnell | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dighe | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Webb | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Donaldson OBE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Joy Marcuse | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Natasha Suzanne Anderson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Hanson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Jane Taylor | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
William Darley MA ACA | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.