Accounts and annual returns ETCHING HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1128146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 September 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 02 September 2023 04 October 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 02 September 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 September 2021 28 June 2023 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 September 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2020 Not Required