Trustees WHARFEDALE & AIREBOROUGH METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

48 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TIMOTHY MARK PERKINS Chair
SKIPTON AND GRASSINGTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Wendy Walker Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Thomas Wade Morrish Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Pauline Tate Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
David Halstead Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Jonathan Hugh Walker Trustee 13 September 2023
CHRISTCHURCH ILKLEY
Received: On time
John Facer Tattersall Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Susan Ward Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Rev Malcolm Cameron Stirk Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Neil Andrew Moffoot Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Judith Nordby Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Juliana Caukwell Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Morrish Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Carol Margaret Newton Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr David Gouldesbrough Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Penelope Anne Gwilt Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Alan Keith Pratt Trustee 01 July 2022
OTLEY OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE
Received: On time
John David Burland Trustee 01 September 2021
OTLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 9 days late
Stephen Alfred Jennings Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Alan Sheath Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record