THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, LOUDWATER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC co-operates with the incumbent in promoting the whole mission of the church, pastoral, social, evangelistic and ecumenical, within the parish and supports outside mission. In addition to regular and special church services (including weddings, funerals and baptisms), it provides a range of activities catering for all ages in the community and hosts a number of community groups on site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S PCC, LOUDWATER (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Christopher Rodgers | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LOUISA TILLOTSON SMITHIES | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD SINTON | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Shiels | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Sheila Wilkie | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Breeze | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Ian Paul Cheffy | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Richard Walne | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rayner | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Joshua Gill | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Patrick Shallow | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS EVELYN ANN CARTLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ROBERT CROMPTON LOADMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
NIGEL JOHN PEACH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361.21k | £534.64k | £401.36k | £406.60k | £415.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.54k | £288.15k | £382.93k | £488.70k | £408.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.10k | £2.40k | £18.41k | £16.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £515.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £9.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £9.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £385 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £239.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £288.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £15.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Vicarage
Treadaway Hill
Loudwater
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP10 9QL
- Phone:
- 01628526087
- Email:
- info@loudwater.org
- Website:
-
stpetersloudwater.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window