TRUE CARE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing food provisions to low-income families in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 January 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 February 2009: Standard registration
- TRUE CARE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATALIE morgan | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALI JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
tama lubinda | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/01/2018 | 19/01/2019 | 19/01/2020 | 19/01/2021 | 19/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.87k | £6.93k | £58.05k | £22.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £6.85k | £57.61k | £21.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 19 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 19 January 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 January 2021 | 16 December 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 January 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 20 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF LOW INCOME FAMILIES IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FOOD AND OTHER ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caci House
9 spring villa park
Spring Villa Road
london
County (optional)
HA8 7EB
- Phone:
- 02071187790
- Website:
-
truecarefoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window