GOLDEN CENTRE OF OPPORTUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES TO THE ELDERLY AND WELFARE ADVICE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.THROUGH A DROP IN CENTRE .WE ALSO HELP FIND EMPLOYMENT.BY PROVIDING A WORK CLUB AND A JOB CLUB TO ASSIST IN APPLICATION, INTERVIEW SKILLS, LETTER WRITING.ETC. WE HELP THOSE FOR WHOM ENGLISH IS NOT THEIR FIRST LANGUAGE WITH APPEALS AT TRIBUNALS, TEACH IT SKILLS ,ESOL CLASSES ,AND PROVIDE A HOME WORK CLUB
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £34,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 24 April 2009: Standard registration
- NO (Working name)
- SOMALI GOLDEN AGE CARE GROUP (Previous name)
- SOMALI GOLDEN CENTRE OF OPPORTUNITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDI MOHOMED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AWALE DAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED Yussuf SECRETARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AHMED ABDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.84k | £100.47k | £105.33k | £38.31k | £83.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.91k | £99.14k | £102.20k | £36.81k | £82.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.50k | £20.78k | £16.16k | £9.00k | £34.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF SOMALI CITIZENS IN MANCHESTER BY; A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Golden Centre Of Opportunities
Windrush Millennium Centre
70 Alexandra Road
MANCHESTER
M16 7WD
- Phone:
- 07794297045
- Email:
- nasara37@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window