Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Charity number: 1127927

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair David Miles Morgan | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Andrew Silk | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Henry Ingram | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
David John Elliott Sewell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Michael Simmons | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deborah Janet Peet | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Geraldine Alice Lambrechts | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Katherine Baie Morgan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gareth David | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Christopher Dixon Bessant | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Stephen Paul Vaughan | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Culshaw | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
HOWARD JOSEPH BODY | Trustee | 19 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.