Trustees SNAP DEVELOPMENT PROJECT
Charity number: 1136223

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saira Ali | Chair | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tomlinson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Dereck Cotterill | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ross Cooper | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Wharmby | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MANDY MANGOLD | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Cannon | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.