MAWDESLEY AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitable purposes of The U3A is: The advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development residing in Mawdesley and Neighbouring Villages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ralph Jolley | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Gerard Farrell | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Mary Murphy | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Baker | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clarke | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Southworth | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Kirkman | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Doyle | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Molyneux | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Parr | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Gornell | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Williams | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Darling | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Bright | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.04k | £11.29k | £89.82k | £122.62k | £161.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.04k | £8.00k | £89.80k | £114.08k | £156.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
The Charitable purpose is: The advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development residing in Mawdesley and Neighbouring Villages.
Area of benefit
MAWDESLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside House
Blue Stone Lane
Mawdesley
ORMSKIRK
Lancashire
L40 2RJ
- Phone:
- 01704 628378
- Email:
- mawdesleyu3a@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
u3asites.org.uk/mawdesley
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window