Governing document MAWDESLEY AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1128556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
The Charitable purpose is: The advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development residing in Mawdesley and Neighbouring Villages.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MAWDESLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.