THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAULS PRESTON PAIGNTON

Charity Number: 1128306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the whole mission of the church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £104,615
Total expenditure: £83,990

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PAUL'S PAIGNTON PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Brookman Chair 29 April 2019
None on record
Patricia Turner Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Carol Green Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Glyn Parry Burns Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Kay Margaret Collins Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Rev Ruth Jane Beckett Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Helen Burns Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
MICHAEL ADRIAN PAUL SNOWDON Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Mark Ivan Brookman Trustee 03 December 2018
None on record
Justine Rosalind Garvey Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
HELEN SNOWDON Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
DR DAVID HARWOOD Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £90.48k £55.75k £70.44k £77.39k £104.62k
Total expenditure £83.67k £76.07k £86.48k £84.66k £83.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Pauls Church
Locarno Avenue
PAIGNTON
TQ3 2DH
Phone:
01803411800