THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. AIDAN, GRAVESEND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; Pastoral work including visiting sick and bereaved; Taking of religous assemblies in schools; Provision of youth clubs, social clubs for the elderly, nursery schools and supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,150 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 16 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST AIDAN, GRAVESEND PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Jeffrey Payne | Chair | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Elizabeth Hollands | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alfred Hollands | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frederick Butler A.I.B. | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kench-Cannon | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter John Harris | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Ashurst | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Dennis Ashurst | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STUART SISTERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET DOROTHY TREVOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER ROWLATT RAWLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN RAWLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN WELCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN ANNE MCINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA MARY POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.35k | £250.61k | £264.09k | £281.52k | £309.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.43k | £252.17k | £266.92k | £297.37k | £295.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
177 MARLING WAY
GRAVESEND
DA12 4RF
- Phone:
- 01474746702
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window