THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, WOKING

Charity number: 1127922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotes the whole mission of the Church of England within the parish of St. Peter Woking both pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £198,017
Total expenditure: £188,108

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE PCC OF WOKING ST. PETER'S (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Jonathan Mark Gutteridge Thomas Chair 07 May 2014
None on record
Celia Jane Murray Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Lesley Ada Dixon Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Alison Heather Cole Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Patrick Chapman Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Rev Lucy Elizabeth Bush Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Louise Jane Webb Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Anthony Morton Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Kay Dodds Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Brenda Joyce Collard Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
PAULINE MARGARET WILDE Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
GEOFFERY CHARLES PUGH Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
RACHEL ELIZABETH JOHNSON Trustee 18 May 2012
None on record
MRS ROSEMARY MCCRUM BA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £192.21k £172.94k £143.59k £160.13k £198.02k
Total expenditure £187.10k £170.61k £160.90k £164.35k £188.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k N/A N/A £2.00k £4.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Office
Church Street
Old Woking
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 9JF
Phone:
01483755852