THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE BOURNE

Charity number: 1127825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC of the Parish of the Bourne is a Church of England Parish in the town of Farnham, Surrey and the Diocese of Guildford. Its activities are to support and develop the presence and mission of the Church of England in its parish.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £363,746
Total expenditure: £406,011

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF ST THOMAS-ON-THE BOURNE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sandra Lea CLARKE Chair 01 July 2019
None on record
Andrea Sari Victoria Smith Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Claire Helen Levens Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
James Patrick Howard HARRISON Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Janet Irene HUGHES Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Jane QUICKE Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Robert HORTON Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Vivienne PICKEN Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Geoff HOOKER Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Nigel CUTHBERT Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Hilary NEWMAN Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer GRANT Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Deborah WILDE Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Janet STEPHEN Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Frances Lorna GARLAND Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Martin William QUICKE Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Michele Joan ENGLAND Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Yvonne May BRYANT Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
Dr Keith William NEWMAN Trustee 22 April 2014
DEMPSTER TRUST
Received: On time
Nigel Andrew LEWIS Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £287.09k £287.09k £331.71k £315.17k £363.75k
Total expenditure £329.90k £329.90k £321.25k £308.88k £406.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.22k £6.21k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 22/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PROMOTING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, THE WORK UNDERTAKEN WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY OR ON BEHALF OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE BOURNE. (2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF THEM BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF (A) PROGRAMMES FOR EDUCATION OR DEVELOPMENT AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND (B) THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH SPORTING AND OTHER PROGRAMMES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS. (4) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SUBSIDIES TO ENABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE BOURNE, FARNHAM, SURREY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Registration history
  • 22 April 2014 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Thomas on the Bourne
Frensham Road
Farnham
GU9 8HA
Phone:
01252715505